House | 05/13/2021 | File Number 686 | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 427 | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7953 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | File Number 549 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | House Calendar Number 393 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/05/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Public Hearing 03/22 | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |