Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06645 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Bill March 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis May 12, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021
Analysis April 21, 2021