LCO No. 5515 1 of 5 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 6645 January Session, 2021 LCO No. 5515 Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT Introduced by: (PD) AN ACT CONCERNING TH E STATE PLAN OF CONS ERVATION AND DEVELOPMENT. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: Section 1. Section 16a-25 of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 2 As used in this chapter: 3 (1) "Process" means the procedure for adopting, amending, revising 4 and implementing a state plan of conservation and development; 5 (2) "Existing plan" means the plan promulgated by Executive Order 6 No. 28, September 27, 1974; 7 (3) "Secretary" means the Secretary of the Office of Policy and 8 Management; 9 (4) "Committee" means the continuing legislative committee on state 10 planning and development established pursuant to section 4-60d; 11 (5) "Adoption year" means the calendar year [which is no later than 12 five years subsequent to the year in which the plan was last adopted in 13 Raised Bill No. 6645 LCO No. 5515 2 of 5 accordance with the process established in this chapter] in which the 14 General Assembly adopts the plan as the plan of conservation and 15 development for the state; 16 (6) "Revision year" means the calendar year immediately preceding 17 the expected adoption year; 18 (7) "Prerevision year" means the calendar year immediately 19 preceding the revision year; 20 (8) "State agency" means any state department, institution, board, 21 commission or official; and 22 (9) "Plan", when referring to the state plan for conservation and 23 development, means the text of such plan and any accompanying 24 locational guide map. 25 Sec. 2. Section 16a-27 of the general statutes is repealed and the 26 following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 27 (a) The secretary, after consultation with all appropriate state, 28 regional and local agencies and other appropriate persons, shall, prior 29 to March 1, 2012, complete a revision of the existing plan and enlarge it 30 to include, but not be limited to, policies relating to transportation, 31 energy and air. Any revision made after July 1, 1995, shall take into 32 consideration the conservation and development of greenways that 33 have been designated by municipalities and shall recommend that state 34 agencies coordinate their efforts to support the development of a state-35 wide greenways system. The Commissioner of Energy and 36 Environmental Protection shall identify state-owned land for inclusion 37 in the plan as potential components of a state greenways system. 38 (b) Any revision made after August 20, 2003, shall take into account 39 (1) economic and community development needs and patterns of 40 commerce, and (2) linkages of affordable housing objectives and land 41 use objectives with transportation systems. 42 (c) Any revision made after March 1, 2006, shall (1) take into 43 Raised Bill No. 6645 LCO No. 5515 3 of 5 consideration risks associated with natural hazards, including, but not 44 limited to, flooding, high winds and wildfires; (2) identify the potential 45 impacts of natural hazards on infrastructure and property; and (3) make 46 recommendations for the siting of future infrastructure and property 47 development to minimize the use of areas prone to natural hazards, 48 including, but not limited to, flooding, high winds and wildfires. 49 (d) Any revision made after July 1, 2005, shall describe the progress 50 towards achievement of the goals and objectives established in the 51 previously adopted state plan of conservation and development and 52 shall identify (1) areas where it is prudent and feasible (A) to have 53 compact, transit accessible, pedestrian-oriented mixed-use 54 development patterns and land reuse, and (B) to promote such 55 development patterns and land reuse, (2) priority funding areas 56 designated under section 16a-35c, and (3) corridor management areas 57 on either side of a limited access highway or a rail line. In designating 58 corridor management areas, the secretary shall make recommendations 59 that (A) promote land use and transportation options to reduce the 60 growth of traffic congestion; (B) connect infrastructure and other 61 development decisions; (C) promote development that minimizes the 62 cost of new infrastructure facilities and maximizes the use of existing 63 infrastructure facilities; and (D) increase intermunicipal and regional 64 cooperation. 65 (e) Any revision made after October 1, 2008, shall (1) for each policy 66 recommended (A) assign a priority; (B) estimate funding for 67 implementation and identify potential funding sources; (C) identify 68 each entity responsible for implementation; and (D) establish a schedule 69 for implementation; and (2) for each growth management principle, 70 determine three benchmarks to measure progress in implementation of 71 the principles, one of which shall be a financial benchmark. 72 (f) Any revision made after October 1, 2009, shall take into 73 consideration the protection and preservation of Connecticut Heritage 74 Areas. 75 Raised Bill No. 6645 LCO No. 5515 4 of 5 (g) Any revision made after December 1, 2011, shall take into 76 consideration (1) the state water supply and resource policies 77 established in sections 22a-380 and 25-33c, and (2) the list prepared by 78 the Commissioner of Public Health pursuant to section 25-33q. 79 (h) Any revision made after October 1, 2019, shall (1) take into 80 consideration risks associated with increased coastal flooding and 81 erosion, depending on site topography, as anticipated in the most recent 82 sea level change scenario updated pursuant to subsection (b) of section 83 25-68o, (2) identify the impacts of such increased flooding and erosion 84 on infrastructure and natural resources, (3) make recommendations for 85 the siting of future infrastructure and property development to 86 minimize the use of areas prone to such flooding and erosion, and (4) 87 take into consideration the state's greenhouse gas reduction goals 88 established pursuant to section 22a-200a. 89 (i) Any revision made after October 1, 2016, shall take into 90 consideration the need for technology infrastructure in the 91 municipality. 92 (j) Thereafter on or before March first in each revision year the 93 secretary shall complete a revision of the plan of conservation and 94 development, provided no revision year may be later than four years 95 subsequent to the year in which the plan was last adopted in accordance 96 with the process established in this chapter. 97 Sec. 3. Section 16a-30 of the general statutes is repealed and the 98 following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 99 (a) (1) The continuing legislative committee on state planning and 100 development shall not later than forty-five days after the convening of 101 the next regularly scheduled session of the General Assembly conduct a 102 public hearing on the plan. Not later than forty-five days after 103 completion of such public hearing, the committee shall submit the plan 104 with its recommendation for approval or disapproval to the General 105 Assembly. The plan shall become effective when adopted by the General 106 Assembly as the plan of conservation and development for the state. 107 Raised Bill No. 6645 LCO No. 5515 5 of 5 (2) Notwithstanding the provisions of this chapter, the plan entitled 108 "Conservation and Development Policies: The Plan for Connecticut, 109 2018-2023", when adopted by the General Assembly as the plan of 110 conservation and development for the state, shall become effective from 111 such adoption and shall remain in effect until December 31, 2024. 112 (b) In the event that the General Assembly disapproves the plan in 113 whole or in part the plan shall be deemed to be rejected and shall be 114 returned to the committee for appropriate action. 115 (c) Any project included in the first or second phase of UConn 2000, 116 as defined in subdivision (25) of section 10a-109c, shall constitute part 117 of the state plan of conservation and development approved by the 118 General Assembly. 119 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 from passage 16a-25 Sec. 2 from passage 16a-27 Sec. 3 from passage 16a-30 Statement of Purpose: To (1) amend the process timeline for the revision and adoption of the state plan of conservation and development, and (2) extend to 2024 the application of the plan intended to cover 2018 to 2023, inclusive. [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]