Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
File Number 790
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 555
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9852
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
File Number 551
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
House Calendar Number 395
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/22
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|