Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06647 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 4, 2021
Fiscal Note June 3, 2021
Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Bill March 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis June 4, 2021
Bill May 11, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021
Analysis April 21, 2021