House | 05/28/2021 | File Number 757 | ||
House | 05/28/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 520 | ||
House | 05/28/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9297 | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | File Number 654 | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | House Calendar Number 473 | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Public Hearing 04/05 | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |