Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06655 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 28, 2021
Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Bill March 17, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis May 28, 2021
Analysis May 27, 2021
Bill May 10, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021