House | 04/22/2021 | File Number 583 | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | House Calendar Number 410 | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/21/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/31 | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |