Senate | 07/12/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/28/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/28/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/25/2021 | Public Act 21-177 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule B | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/08/2021 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B | ||
House | 06/08/2021 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 10647 | ||
House | 06/08/2021 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 10638 | ||
House | 06/08/2021 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 10604 | ||
House | 06/08/2021 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 10534 | ||
House | 06/06/2021 | Emergency Certification |