Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06688 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 10, 2021
Fiscal Note June 8, 2021
Fiscal Note June 7, 2021
Bill June 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis October 7, 2021
Analysis June 8, 2021
Analysis June 7, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 25, 2021