House
|
06/08/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Adopted, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 9888
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 9908
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 9848
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 428
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
House Adopted, but not by the Necessary 3/4ths
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 8255
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 8254
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 7738
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 8258
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
File Number 96
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
House Calendar Number 103
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|