Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HJ00058 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 7, 2021
Fiscal Note June 3, 2021
Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021
Bill February 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 6, 2021
Analysis March 22, 2021