House | 06/04/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Adopted, Senate | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Not Properly Before the Senate, Senate Amendment Schedule A 9505 | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 417 | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | File Number 97 | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | House Calendar Number 104 | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/05/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 02/17/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |