LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2021 Regular Session
House
Bills
HJ00059
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut House Bill HJ00059
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2021 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HJ00059
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
June 3, 2021
Compare
Fiscal Note
May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note
May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note
May 5, 2021
Bill
March 22, 2021
Compare
Fiscal Note
March 22, 2021
Bill
February 16, 2021
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
September 1, 2021
Analysis
March 22, 2021