House | 06/07/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/07/2021 | Adopted, Senate as Amended by House A | ||
House | 06/07/2021 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | File Number 732 | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 482 | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | On Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | Adopted, House as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9110 | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | File Number 585 | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | House Calendar Number 412 | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/21/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Public Hearing 03/26 | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |