House
|
06/07/2021
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Adopted, Senate as Amended by House A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
File Number 736
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 486
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Adopted, House as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9107
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
File Number 588
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
House Calendar Number 415
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/21/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/26
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|