Senate | 06/24/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/16/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/16/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/15/2021 | Public Act 21-69 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/04/2021 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | House Calendar Number 353 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | File Number 11 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 52 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/26/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/03/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Public Hearing 02/09 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/19/2021 | Vote to Draft |