LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2021 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB00056
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00056
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2021 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00056
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
March 4, 2021
Bill
January 11, 2021
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
July 21, 2021
Bill
March 4, 2021
Compare
Analysis
March 4, 2021
Bill
January 29, 2021
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
June 15, 2021
Compare