Senate | 03/12/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | Public Hearing 02/18 |