Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Public Act 21-47
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
House Calendar Number 354
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6711
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
File Number 312
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 205
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/09
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2021
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|