Senate | 06/09/2021 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | File Number 353 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 219 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/19/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |