Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00263 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note April 27, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021
Fiscal Note February 25, 2021
Bill January 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis September 7, 2021
Analysis May 6, 2021
Analysis May 5, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021
Analysis February 25, 2021
Bill February 25, 2021

Chaptered

Bill May 18, 2021