Senate
|
07/07/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2021
|
Public Act 21-127
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
House Calendar Number 443
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7651
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
File Number 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 23
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/24/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Public Hearing 01/28
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|