Senate | 05/26/2021 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | File Number 13 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 49 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/26/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/03/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Public Hearing 02/04 | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |