Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Public Act 21-20
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
House Calendar Number 355
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 6781
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6763
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
File Number 125
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 125
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|