Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00608 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021
Fiscal Note March 24, 2021
Bill January 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 31, 2021
Analysis April 15, 2021
Bill March 24, 2021
Analysis March 24, 2021
Bill March 2, 2021

Chaptered

Bill May 27, 2021