Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
House Calendar Number 517
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 8775
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 8752
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8739
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8661
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
File Number 398
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 244
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/18
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|