Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00668 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Bill January 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis May 19, 2021
Bill May 4, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021
Bill March 17, 2021