Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
House Calendar Number 581
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8236
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
File Number 183
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 145
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/11
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|