Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00711 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/29/2021

                     
Researcher: TA 	Page 1 	3/29/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
SB 711  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING COVID -19 RELIEF FOR SMALL 
BUSINESSES AND REQUIRING FEDERAL REGULATORY 
ANALYSIS FOR PROPOSED STATE REGULATIONS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill creates a “non-charge” against an employer’s experience 
rate for the unemployment benefits paid to former employees whom 
the Labor commissioner (or his designee) determines became partially 
or totally unemployed because of COVID-19. (This provision codifies 
Executive Order 7W (§ 2), which the governor issued on April 9, 2020.) 
The bill also establishes a sales and use tax exemption for small 
businesses for personal protective equipment used or worn to prevent 
COVID-19 infection or transmission. Lastly, it requires state agencies 
to prepare a federal regulatory analysis when adopting regulations. 
Generally, the analysis must compare the proposed regulation with 
any similar federal regulations. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  (1) July 1, 2021, for the unemployment 
provision and sales and use tax provision, with the latter applicable to 
sales occurring on or after that date; (2) October 1, 2021, for the 
regulatory analysis; and (3) January 1, 2022, for a conforming change. 
§§ 1 & 2 — UNEMPLOYMENT NON -CHARGE 
The bill creates a “non-charge” against an employer’s experience 
rate for the unemployment benefits paid to former employees whom 
the Labor commissioner (or his designee) determines became partially 
or totally unemployed because of COVID-19. This includes former 
employees who, through no fault of their own, became partially or 
fully unemployed during the public health and civil preparedness 
emergency declared by the governor on March 10, 2020, and any 
period of extension or renewal. In effect, this allows employers to lay  2021SB-00711-R000183-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: TA 	Page 2 	3/29/21 
 
off these employees without increasing the employer’s unemployment 
taxes (see BACKGROUND). 
As with most other unemployment non-charges, the bill’s non-
charge provision does not apply to “reimbursing employers” (e.g., the 
state and municipalities) who do not pay unemployment taxes but 
instead directly reimburse the unemployment trust fund for the 
benefits collected by their former employees. 
§ 3 — SALES AND USE TAX EXEMPTION 
The bill establishes a sales and use tax exemption for small 
businesses for personal protective equipment used or worn to prevent 
COVID-19 infection or transmission. Under the bill, a small business 
(1) is a corporation, limited liability company, partnership, sole 
proprietorship, or individual, operating a business for a profit and (2) 
has up to 100 full-time employees, including subsidiaries or affiliated 
corporations. The bill does not establish a mechanism for sellers to 
verify which businesses are eligible for the exemption.  
§§ 4 & 5 — FEDERAL REGULATORY A NALYSIS 
The bill requires state agencies to prepare a federal regulatory 
analysis when adopting regulations. They must do so before, or 
concurrently with, posting a notice of intent to adopt regulations on 
the eRegulations System. The analysis must identify (1) the proposed 
regulation’s scope and objectives, (2) each comparable federal 
regulation and how it differs from the proposed regulation, (3) any 
adverse impact of the federal regulation on small businesses, and (4) 
the extent to which the agency attempted to avoid the adverse impact 
when developing the regulation. The agency must also submit the 
analysis to the Regulation Review Committee. 
For purposes of this analysis, a “small business” is a business entity 
that, including its affiliates, (1) is independently owned and operated 
and (2) employs fewer than 250 full-time employees or has gross 
annual sales of less than $5 million. The agency may define “small 
business” to include a greater number of full-time employees, up to the 
applicable federal standard or 500, whichever is less.  2021SB-00711-R000183-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: TA 	Page 3 	3/29/21 
 
BACKGROUND 
Related Bill 
HB 5377, reported favorably by the Labor and Public Employees 
Committee, disregards an employer’s benefit charges and taxable 
wages between July 1, 2019, and June 30, 2021, when calculating the 
employer’s unemployment tax experience rate for taxable years 
starting on or after January 1, 2022. 
Unemployment Non-Charge 
In general, a portion of a private-sector employer’s unemployment 
insurance tax is based on the employer’s “experience rate,” which 
reflects the amount of unemployment benefits paid to former 
employees. Typically, laying off employees leads to a higher 
experience rate and higher unemployment tax for the employer. The 
law, however, allows several non-charging separations in which an 
employee can collect benefits that are not charged against a former 
employer’s experience rate (e.g., voluntarily leaving work to care for a 
seriously ill spouse, parent, or child), and thus do not increase the 
employer’s unemployment taxes. In these instances, the cost of the 
benefits paid to the former employee is shared by all employers who 
pay unemployment taxes. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Commerce Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 23 Nay 0 (03/11/2021)