Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Public Act 21-7
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
House Calendar Number 441
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7265
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
File Number 16
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 53
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/03/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/09
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
|
|
|