Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00817 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 27, 2021
Fiscal Note March 4, 2021
Bill January 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis July 26, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021
Bill March 4, 2021
Analysis March 4, 2021

Chaptered

Bill May 13, 2021