Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00817 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/29/2021

                     
Researcher: ND 	Page 1 	4/29/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
SB 817 (File 16, as amended by Senate "A")*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING SENIOR CENTERS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill establishes a 14-member statewide senior center working 
group to develop a coordinated plan for senior centers and municipal 
services for seniors. It also requires the Commission on Women, 
Children, Seniors, Equity, and Opportunity, within available 
appropriations, to assist senior centers and assign or appoint necessary 
personnel to do so.  
By law, municipalities must appoint a municipal agent for the 
elderly to help seniors learn about community resources and file for 
benefits. The bill expands the list of potential appointees to include 
senior center staff members. Current law limits potential appointees to 
(1) members of a municipal agency that serves the elderly or (2) 
municipal residents with a demonstrated interest in the elderly or who 
have been involved in aging programs.  
The bill also authorizes any one or more municipalities, or private 
organizations that serve older adults and are designated to act as 
agents of one or more municipalities, to establish a “multipurpose 
senior center,” which is a community facility that organizes and 
provides a broad spectrum of senior services, including recreational 
activities and health (including mental and behavioral health), social, 
nutritional, and educational services (42 U.S.C. § 3002).  
Additionally, the bill expands the scope of the state’s Community 
Response Education Program to include resources for community 
programs and education on senior sexual assault and abuse safety, 
prevention, and risk reduction. This program, within available 
appropriations, offers certain resources to neighborhoods and 
municipalities that are notified that a registered sex offender is living  2021SB-00817-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 2 	4/29/21 
 
there or plans to do so.  
Lastly, the bill makes technical changes.  
*Senate Amendment “A” adds the provision expanding the scope of 
the Community Response Education Program.  
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2021, except the provision on the 
Community Response Education Program takes effect July 1, 2021.  
§ 4 — STATEWIDE SENIOR CEN TER WORKGROUP 
 Membership  
The bill establishes a 14-member statewide senior center working 
group to develop a coordinated plan for senior centers and municipal 
services for older adults. The group’s members must include:  
1. the aging and disability services and social services 
commissioners, or their designees;  
2. the executive director of the Commission on Women, Children, 
Seniors, Equity and Opportunity; 
3. two representatives of the Connecticut Association of Senior 
Center Personnel, appointed by the Senate majority leader, who 
may be legislators;  
4. one representative of the Connecticut Association of Municipal 
Agents for the Elderly, appointed by the governor; 
5. one representative of the Connecticut Local Administrators of 
Social Services, appointed by the House minority leader and 
who may be a legislator;  
6. five representatives of senior centers, with one each from the 
state’s five elderly planning and services areas, two each 
appointed by the House Speaker and Senate President, and one 
appointed by the House majority leader, who may be 
legislators;   2021SB-00817-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 3 	4/29/21 
 
7. one representative of a nonprofit senior center, appointed by the 
governor; and  
8. one representative from a National Institute of Senior Centers 
(NISC)-accredited senior center, appointed by the Senate 
minority leader, who may be a legislator.  
Appointing authorities must make initial appointments by October 
31, 2021, and fill any vacancies. The commission’s executive director 
serves as the working group’s chairperson and must hold the first 
meeting by November 30, 2021.  
The commission’s administrative staff serve as the working group’s 
administrative staff.  
Duties  
The bill requires the working group to: 
1. develop an annual plan to support and develop senior centers 
and municipal services for older adults, including identifying 
training needs and coordinating existing resources;  
2. evaluate the feasibility of implementing standards for 
delivering core services and make recommendations for these 
standards, including those allowing for parity of core services 
across municipalities while maintaining service delivery 
flexibility;  
3. consult with the five area agencies on aging and other agencies; 
4. facilitate coordination and communication among senior centers 
and municipal services for older adults with executive branch 
departments, including the departments of aging and disability 
services, housing, mental health and addiction services, public 
health, social services, and transportation, as well as with 
community agencies and initiatives impacting older adults; 
5. develop and provide access to best practices and procedures for 
senior centers and municipal services for older adults; and   2021SB-00817-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 4 	4/29/21 
 
6. recommend any necessary appropriations or legislative changes 
to the legislature’s Aging, Housing, Human Services, Planning 
and Development, Public Health, and Transportation 
committees.  
Report 
By January 1, 2023, the working group must report its findings and 
recommendations to the Aging, Housing, Human Services, Planning 
and Development, Public Health, and Transportation committees. The 
working group terminates when it submits the report or January 1, 
2023, whichever is later.  
§ 3 — COMMISSION ASSISTANC E TO SENIOR CENTERS  
The bill requires the Commission on Women, Children, Seniors, 
Equity and Opportunity, within available appropriations, to provide 
assistance to senior centers and assign or appoint necessary personnel 
to do so. Assistance may include:  
1. establishing and maintaining a list of senior centers and 
municipal services for older adults, as well as a list of resources 
for their staff; 
2. developing technical assistance for the staff, directly or by 
referral to experts; 
3. communicating regularly with the staff about local, state, and 
federal support and services that interest them; and  
4. facilitating the statewide senior center working group, as 
described above.  
§ 2 — MULTIPURPOSE SENIOR CENTERS  
Under the bill, a multi-purpose senior center may provide the 
following services:  
1. nutrition services, 
2. health and wellness programs,  2021SB-00817-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 5 	4/29/21 
 
3. employment assistance,  
4. intergenerational initiatives,  
5. community service and civic engagement opportunities,  
6. public benefits counseling,  
7. socialization and educational opportunities,  
8. transportation,  
9. peer counseling,  
10. financial and retirement counseling,  
11. arts and recreation programs, and  
12. case management services. 
§ 5 — COMMUNITY RESPONSE E DUCATION PROGRAM 
The bill expands the allowable scope of the state’s Community 
Response Education Program to include resources for: 
1. police departments and municipal officials to provide programs 
on senior citizen sexual assault and abuse safety, prevention, 
and risk reduction and  
2. educating seniors, in addition to families and children as under 
current law, on preventing and avoiding sexual abuse and 
assault.  
Under existing law, the Court Support Services Division (in 
conjunction with experts in related fields) administers the program, 
within available appropriations, to help neighborhoods, parents, and 
children learn how to better protect themselves from sexual assault 
and sexual abuse. The bill specifies that neighborhoods include senior 
centers or other facilities serving or housing seniors.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Aging Committee  2021SB-00817-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 6 	4/29/21 
 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 15 Nay 0 (02/16/2021)