House
|
06/07/2021
|
House Calendar Number 605
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
File Number 660
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 391
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/09
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
|
|
|