Senate | 05/26/2021 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | File Number 41 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 64 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |