Senate | 03/17/2021 | File Number 80 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 81 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |