Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00882 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 6, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021