LCO \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00882-R01- SB.docx 1 of 5 General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 882 January Session, 2021 AN ACT CONCERNING CL IMATE CHANGE MITIGAT ION AND HOME ENERGY AFFORDABILITY . Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 22a-200a of the general statutes is 1 repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2 2021): 3 (a) The state shall reduce the level of emissions of greenhouse gas: 4 (1) Not later than January 1, 2020, to a level at least ten per cent below 5 the level emitted in 1990; 6 (2) Not later than January 1, 2030, to a level at least forty-five per cent 7 below the level emitted in 2001; [and] 8 (3) Not later than January 1, 2040, to a level of zero per cent from 9 electricity supplied to electric customers in the state; 10 [(3)] (4) Not later than January 1, 2050, to a level at least eighty per 11 cent below the level emitted in 2001; [.] and 12 [(4)] (5) All of the levels referenced in this subsection shall be 13 determined by the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental 14 Protection. 15 Substitute Bill No. 882 LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00882- R01-SB.docx } 2 of 5 Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2021) (a) (1) As used in this section, 16 "Home Energy Label" means (A) a United States Department of Energy 17 Home Energy Score, (B) a Home Energy Rating System Index Score, or 18 (C) an ENERGY STAR Score. 19 (2) The Department of Energy and Environmental Protection may 20 adopt regulations, in accordance with the provisions of chapter 54 of the 21 general statutes, that qualify additional standards as a Home Energy 22 Label. 23 (b) (1) A landlord shall provide a Home Energy Label for any 24 dwelling unit wherever such dwelling unit is publicly listed to rent, 25 unless such rent payment will include all charges for electricity, natural 26 gas or heating fuel, as defined in section 16a-23m of the general statutes. 27 (2) Notwithstanding the provisions of subdivision (1) of this 28 subsection, a landlord may comply with the requirements of this section 29 by providing the: (A) Total monthly costs of electricity, natural gas or 30 heating fuel for such dwelling unit during the most recent twelve 31 months of occupation; (B) total monthly amounts of electricity, natural 32 gas or heating fuel consumed for such dwelling unit during the most 33 recent twelve months of occupation; (C) average costs of electricity, 34 natural gas or heating fuel for such dwelling unit during the most recent 35 twelve months of occupation; and (D) average monthly amounts of 36 electricity, natural gas or heating fuel consumed for such dwelling unit 37 during the most recent twelve months of occupation. 38 (c) Each electric distribution and gas company, as defined in section 39 16-1 of the general statutes, heating fuel dealer, as defined in section 16a-40 23m of the general statutes, and other provider of electricity, natural gas 41 or heating fuel shall maintain and make available to a landlord, free of 42 charge, records of the energy consumption data for dwelling units 43 owned, leased or subleased by said landlord for the preceding twelve 44 months of occupation. The Public Utilities Regulatory Authority may 45 authorize each electric distribution and gas company to recover its 46 prudently incurred information technology costs associated with the 47 Substitute Bill No. 882 LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00882- R01-SB.docx } 3 of 5 collection and distribution of the energy consumption data made 48 available to landlords pursuant to this subsection. 49 (d) If such dwelling unit was unoccupied during part or all of the 50 preceding twelve months, such records shall contain energy 51 consumption data for the most recent twelve months of occupation. 52 (e) No electric distribution company, gas company, heating fuel 53 dealer or other provider of electricity, natural gas or heating fuel shall 54 disclose personally identifiable information in such records when the 55 energy associated account owner and the landlord are not the same 56 person. 57 (f) (1) If any landlord fails to comply with the provisions of this 58 section, the tenant may deduct an amount equivalent to one month's 59 rent from any sum of rent or payment for use and occupancy due and 60 owing, or to become due and owing, to the landlord. 61 (2) Notwithstanding the provisions of section 51-164p of the general 62 statutes, any municipality may, by ordinance, establish a civil penalty 63 payable to such municipality for a violation of this section, provided 64 such civil penalty shall not exceed five hundred dollars for the first 65 violation and one thousand dollars for any subsequent violation. Any 66 person who is assessed a civil penalty pursuant to this section may 67 appeal therefrom to the Superior Court. 68 (3) An appeal shall be instituted not later than thirty days after the 69 mailing of notice of such assessment by filing a petition to reopen 70 assessment, together with an entry fee in an amount equal to the entry 71 fee for a small claims case pursuant to section 52-259 of the general 72 statutes, at the superior court facility designated by the Chief Court 73 Administrator, which shall entitle such person to a hearing in 74 accordance with the rules of the judges of the Superior Court. 75 (4) The remedies in this subsection shall be in addition to any other 76 remedies available at law, or in equity, to any person. This section shall 77 not be construed to limit or restrict the authority of any state or local 78 Substitute Bill No. 882 LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00882- R01-SB.docx } 4 of 5 housing or health code enforcement agency. 79 Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2021) (a) (1) As used in this section, 80 "Home Energy Label" means (A) a United States Department of Energy 81 Home Energy Score, (B) a Home Energy Rating System Index Score, or 82 (C) an ENERGY STAR Score. 83 (2) The Department of Energy and Environmental Protection may 84 adopt regulations, in accordance with the provisions of chapter 54 of the 85 general statutes, that qualify additional standards as a Home Energy 86 Label. 87 (b) (1) A residential property owner may provide a Home Energy 88 Label for any residential property wherever such residential property is 89 publicly listed for sale. 90 (2) Notwithstanding the provisions of subdivision (1) of this 91 subsection, a residential property owner may provide, wherever such 92 residential property is publicly listed for sale, the: (A) Total monthly 93 costs of electricity, natural gas or heating fuel for such residential 94 property during the most recent twelve months of occupation; (B) total 95 monthly amounts of electricity, natural gas or heating fuel consumed 96 for such residential property during the most recent twelve months of 97 occupation; (C) average costs of electricity, natural gas or heating fuel 98 for such residential property during the most recent twelve months of 99 occupation; and (D) average monthly amounts of electricity, natural gas 100 or heating fuel consumed for such residential property during the most 101 recent twelve months of occupation. 102 (c) Each electric distribution and gas company, as defined in section 103 16-1 of the general statutes, heating fuel dealer, as defined in section 16a-104 23m of the general statutes, and other provider of electricity, natural gas 105 or heating fuel shall maintain and make available to a residential 106 property owner, free of charge, records of the energy consumption data 107 for residential properties owned by said residential property owner for 108 the preceding twelve months of occupation. The Public Utilities 109 Substitute Bill No. 882 LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00882- R01-SB.docx } 5 of 5 Regulatory Authority may authorize each electric distribution and gas 110 company to recover its prudently incurred information technology costs 111 associated with the collection and distribution of the energy 112 consumption data made available to residential property owners 113 pursuant to this subsection. 114 (d) If such residential property was unoccupied during part or all of 115 the preceding twelve months, such records shall contain energy 116 consumption data for the most recent twelve months of occupation. 117 (e) No electric distribution company, gas company, heating fuel 118 dealer or other provider of electricity, natural gas or heating fuel shall 119 disclose personally identifiable information in such records when the 120 energy associated account owner and the residential property owner are 121 not the same person. 122 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 July 1, 2021 22a-200a(a) Sec. 2 October 1, 2021 New section Sec. 3 October 1, 2021 New section ET Joint Favorable Subst.