Senate | 05/21/2021 | House Calendar Number 529 | ||
Senate | 05/21/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | File Number 186 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 148 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |