Senate | 03/04/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |