Senate | 05/14/2021 | House Calendar Number 499 | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | File Number 288 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 202 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |