Senate | 06/14/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/07/2021 | Special Act 21-9 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/02/2021 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 06/02/2021 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 05/28/2021 | House Calendar Number 562 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/26/2021 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/26/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | File Number 425 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 256 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Public Hearing 03/19 | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |