Senate | 06/05/2021 | House Calendar Number 595 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 06/04/2021 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 06/04/2021 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10132 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | File Number 218 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 166 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |