Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
House Calendar Number 533
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8845
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
File Number 681
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/11/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
File Number 403
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 247
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|