Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00943 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis May 20, 2021
Bill May 12, 2021
Analysis May 12, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021