Senate
|
07/07/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Public Act 21-148
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
House Calendar Number 502
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7606
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
File Number 515
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 310
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|