Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00955 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis October 1, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 24, 2021