1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | LCO No. 3655 1 of 3 |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | General Assembly Raised Bill No. 957 |
---|
7 | 7 | | January Session, 2021 |
---|
8 | 8 | | LCO No. 3655 |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES |
---|
12 | 12 | | |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | Introduced by: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (HS) |
---|
16 | 16 | | |
---|
17 | 17 | | |
---|
18 | 18 | | |
---|
19 | 19 | | |
---|
20 | 20 | | AN ACT EXPANDING ACC ESS TO IN-HOME COUNSELING. |
---|
21 | 21 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General |
---|
22 | 22 | | Assembly convened: |
---|
23 | 23 | | |
---|
24 | 24 | | Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 17b-242 of the general statutes is 1 |
---|
25 | 25 | | repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2 |
---|
26 | 26 | | 2021): 3 |
---|
27 | 27 | | (a) The Department of Social Services shall determine the rates to be 4 |
---|
28 | 28 | | paid to home health care agencies and home health aide agencies by the 5 |
---|
29 | 29 | | state or any town in the state for persons aided or cared for by the state 6 |
---|
30 | 30 | | or any such town. [For the period from February 1, 1991, to January 31, 7 |
---|
31 | 31 | | 1992, inclusive, payment for each service to the state shall be based upon 8 |
---|
32 | 32 | | the rate for such service as determined by the Office of Health Care 9 |
---|
33 | 33 | | Access, except that for those providers whose Medicaid rates for the 10 |
---|
34 | 34 | | year ending January 31, 1991, exceed the median rate, no increase shall 11 |
---|
35 | 35 | | be allowed. For those providers whose rates for the year ending January 12 |
---|
36 | 36 | | 31, 1991, are below the median rate, increases shall not exceed the lower 13 |
---|
37 | 37 | | of the prior rate increased by the most recent annual increase in the 14 |
---|
38 | 38 | | consumer price index for urban consumers or the median rate. In no 15 |
---|
39 | 39 | | case shall any such rate exceed the eightieth percentile of rates in effect 16 Raised Bill No. 957 |
---|
40 | 40 | | |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | LCO No. 3655 2 of 3 |
---|
44 | 44 | | |
---|
45 | 45 | | January 31, 1991, nor shall any rate exceed the charge to the general 17 |
---|
46 | 46 | | public for similar services. Rates effective February 1, 1992, shall be 18 |
---|
47 | 47 | | based upon rates as determined by the Office of Health Care Access, 19 |
---|
48 | 48 | | except that increases shall not exceed the prior year's rate increased by 20 |
---|
49 | 49 | | the most recent annual increase in the consumer price index for urban 21 |
---|
50 | 50 | | consumers and rates effective February 1, 1992, shall remain in effect 22 |
---|
51 | 51 | | through June 30, 1993. Rates effective July 1, 1993, shall be based upon 23 |
---|
52 | 52 | | rates as determined by the Office of Health Care Access except if the 24 |
---|
53 | 53 | | Medicaid rates for any service for the period ending June 30, 1993, 25 |
---|
54 | 54 | | exceed the median rate for such service, the increase effective July 1, 26 |
---|
55 | 55 | | 1993, shall not exceed one per cent. If the Medicaid rate for any service 27 |
---|
56 | 56 | | for the period ending June 30, 1993, is below the median rate, the 28 |
---|
57 | 57 | | increase effective July 1, 1993, shall not exceed the lower of the prior rate 29 |
---|
58 | 58 | | increased by one and one-half times the most recent annual increase in 30 |
---|
59 | 59 | | the consumer price index for urban consumers or the median rate plus 31 |
---|
60 | 60 | | one per cent.] The Commissioner of Social Services shall establish a fee 32 |
---|
61 | 61 | | schedule for home health services to be effective on and after July 1, 33 |
---|
62 | 62 | | 1994. The commissioner may annually modify such fee schedule if such 34 |
---|
63 | 63 | | modification is needed to ensure that the conversion to an 35 |
---|
64 | 64 | | administrative services organization is cost neutral to home health care 36 |
---|
65 | 65 | | agencies and home health aide agencies in the aggregate and ensures 37 |
---|
66 | 66 | | patient access. Utilization may be a factor in determining cost neutrality. 38 |
---|
67 | 67 | | The commissioner shall increase the fee schedule for home health 39 |
---|
68 | 68 | | services provided under the Connecticut home-care program for the 40 |
---|
69 | 69 | | elderly established under section 17b-342, effective July 1, 2000, by two 41 |
---|
70 | 70 | | per cent over the fee schedule for home health services for the previous 42 |
---|
71 | 71 | | year. The commissioner may increase any fee payable to a home health 43 |
---|
72 | 72 | | care agency or home health aide agency upon the application of such an 44 |
---|
73 | 73 | | agency evidencing extraordinary costs related to (1) serving persons 45 |
---|
74 | 74 | | with AIDS; (2) high-risk maternal and child health care; (3) escort 46 |
---|
75 | 75 | | services; or (4) extended hour services. In no case shall any rate or fee 47 |
---|
76 | 76 | | exceed the charge to the general public for similar services. The 48 |
---|
77 | 77 | | commissioner shall include in the fee schedule a rate to be paid for in-49 |
---|
78 | 78 | | home behavioral health counseling, assessment and support services 50 |
---|
79 | 79 | | provided by a social worker licensed pursuant to chapter 383b who is 51 Raised Bill No. 957 |
---|
80 | 80 | | |
---|
81 | 81 | | |
---|
82 | 82 | | |
---|
83 | 83 | | LCO No. 3655 3 of 3 |
---|
84 | 84 | | |
---|
85 | 85 | | employed by a home health care agency. A home health care agency or 52 |
---|
86 | 86 | | home health aide agency which, due to any material change in 53 |
---|
87 | 87 | | circumstances, is aggrieved by a rate determined pursuant to this 54 |
---|
88 | 88 | | subsection may, within ten days of receipt of written notice of such rate 55 |
---|
89 | 89 | | from the Commissioner of Social Services, request in writing a hearing 56 |
---|
90 | 90 | | on all items of aggrievement. The commissioner shall, upon the receipt 57 |
---|
91 | 91 | | of all documentation necessary to evaluate the request, determine 58 |
---|
92 | 92 | | whether there has been such a change in circumstances and shall 59 |
---|
93 | 93 | | conduct a hearing if appropriate. The Commissioner of Social Services 60 |
---|
94 | 94 | | shall adopt regulations, in accordance with chapter 54, to implement the 61 |
---|
95 | 95 | | provisions of this subsection. The commissioner may implement 62 |
---|
96 | 96 | | policies and procedures to carry out the provisions of this subsection 63 |
---|
97 | 97 | | while in the process of adopting regulations, provided notice of intent 64 |
---|
98 | 98 | | to adopt the regulations is [published in the Connecticut Law Journal] 65 |
---|
99 | 99 | | posted on the eRegulations System not later than twenty days after the 66 |
---|
100 | 100 | | date of implementing the policies and procedures. Such policies and 67 |
---|
101 | 101 | | procedures shall be valid for not longer than nine months. 68 |
---|
102 | 102 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following |
---|
103 | 103 | | sections: |
---|
104 | 104 | | |
---|
105 | 105 | | Section 1 July 1, 2021 17b-242(a) |
---|
106 | 106 | | |
---|
107 | 107 | | Statement of Purpose: |
---|
108 | 108 | | To expand access to in-home behavioral health counseling provided by |
---|
109 | 109 | | social workers employed by home health care agencies by providing |
---|
110 | 110 | | Medicaid reimbursement for such counseling. |
---|
111 | 111 | | [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except |
---|
112 | 112 | | that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not |
---|
113 | 113 | | underlined.] |
---|
114 | 114 | | |
---|