Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00957 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/24/2021

                                
 
 
LCO No. 3655  	1 of 3 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 957  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 3655 
 
 
Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(HS)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT EXPANDING ACC ESS TO IN-HOME COUNSELING. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 17b-242 of the general statutes is 1 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2 
2021): 3 
(a) The Department of Social Services shall determine the rates to be 4 
paid to home health care agencies and home health aide agencies by the 5 
state or any town in the state for persons aided or cared for by the state 6 
or any such town. [For the period from February 1, 1991, to January 31, 7 
1992, inclusive, payment for each service to the state shall be based upon 8 
the rate for such service as determined by the Office of Health Care 9 
Access, except that for those providers whose Medicaid rates for the 10 
year ending January 31, 1991, exceed the median rate, no increase shall 11 
be allowed. For those providers whose rates for the year ending January 12 
31, 1991, are below the median rate, increases shall not exceed the lower 13 
of the prior rate increased by the most recent annual increase in the 14 
consumer price index for urban consumers or the median rate. In no 15 
case shall any such rate exceed the eightieth percentile of rates in effect 16  Raised Bill No.  957 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3655   	2 of 3 
 
January 31, 1991, nor shall any rate exceed the charge to the general 17 
public for similar services. Rates effective February 1, 1992, shall be 18 
based upon rates as determined by the Office of Health Care Access, 19 
except that increases shall not exceed the prior year's rate increased by 20 
the most recent annual increase in the consumer price index for urban 21 
consumers and rates effective February 1, 1992, shall remain in effect 22 
through June 30, 1993. Rates effective July 1, 1993, shall be based upon 23 
rates as determined by the Office of Health Care Access except if the 24 
Medicaid rates for any service for the period ending June 30, 1993, 25 
exceed the median rate for such service, the increase effective July 1, 26 
1993, shall not exceed one per cent. If the Medicaid rate for any service 27 
for the period ending June 30, 1993, is below the median rate, the 28 
increase effective July 1, 1993, shall not exceed the lower of the prior rate 29 
increased by one and one-half times the most recent annual increase in 30 
the consumer price index for urban consumers or the median rate plus 31 
one per cent.] The Commissioner of Social Services shall establish a fee 32 
schedule for home health services to be effective on and after July 1, 33 
1994. The commissioner may annually modify such fee schedule if such 34 
modification is needed to ensure that the conversion to an 35 
administrative services organization is cost neutral to home health care 36 
agencies and home health aide agencies in the aggregate and ensures 37 
patient access. Utilization may be a factor in determining cost neutrality. 38 
The commissioner shall increase the fee schedule for home health 39 
services provided under the Connecticut home-care program for the 40 
elderly established under section 17b-342, effective July 1, 2000, by two 41 
per cent over the fee schedule for home health services for the previous 42 
year. The commissioner may increase any fee payable to a home health 43 
care agency or home health aide agency upon the application of such an 44 
agency evidencing extraordinary costs related to (1) serving persons 45 
with AIDS; (2) high-risk maternal and child health care; (3) escort 46 
services; or (4) extended hour services. In no case shall any rate or fee 47 
exceed the charge to the general public for similar services. The 48 
commissioner shall include in the fee schedule a rate to be paid for in-49 
home behavioral health counseling, assessment and support services 50 
provided by a social worker licensed pursuant to chapter 383b who is 51  Raised Bill No.  957 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3655   	3 of 3 
 
employed by a home health care agency. A home health care agency or 52 
home health aide agency which, due to any material change in 53 
circumstances, is aggrieved by a rate determined pursuant to this 54 
subsection may, within ten days of receipt of written notice of such rate 55 
from the Commissioner of Social Services, request in writing a hearing 56 
on all items of aggrievement. The commissioner shall, upon the receipt 57 
of all documentation necessary to evaluate the request, determine 58 
whether there has been such a change in circumstances and shall 59 
conduct a hearing if appropriate. The Commissioner of Social Services 60 
shall adopt regulations, in accordance with chapter 54, to implement the 61 
provisions of this subsection. The commissioner may implement 62 
policies and procedures to carry out the provisions of this subsection 63 
while in the process of adopting regulations, provided notice of intent 64 
to adopt the regulations is [published in the Connecticut Law Journal] 65 
posted on the eRegulations System not later than twenty days after the 66 
date of implementing the policies and procedures. Such policies and 67 
procedures shall be valid for not longer than nine months. 68 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021 17b-242(a) 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To expand access to in-home behavioral health counseling provided by 
social workers employed by home health care agencies by providing 
Medicaid reimbursement for such counseling. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]