Senate | 06/28/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/18/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/18/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/16/2021 | Public Act 21-100 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/05/2021 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | House Calendar Number 446 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | File Number 488 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 292 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/09/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |